This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 12:03:26 (UTC).

MARTINYAN, KARPIS VS KHUDABAKHSHYAN, ARPINE

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 MARTINYAN, KARPIS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KHUDABAKHSHYAN, ARPINE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1822

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINYAN KARPIS

Defendants

CHERCHIYAN KHACHIK

KHUDABAKHSHYAN ARPINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GENOVESE, C. TIMOTHY

GENOVESE C. TIMOTHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP JUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 11/01/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less