Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 19:52:08 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, LIZETE VS EASTMAN, KENNY

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 MARTINEZ, LIZETE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EASTMAN, KENNY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8804

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ LIZETE

Defendants

CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EASTMAN KENNY

D C DRILLING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALPERIN, NORMAN S

HALPERIN NORMAN S

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/12/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: LIZETE MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/22/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 07/20/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - AUTO Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA ASSIGNMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALPERIN NORMAN S