Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2021 at 00:34:17 (UTC).

MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA, ET AL. VS COURTNEY ELISE KURPIESKI

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COURTNEY ELISE KURPIESKI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8897

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OLIVARES A MINOR DAYANA

OLIVARES A MINOR FERNANDO

OLIVARES A MINOR VANESSA SUSANA

OLIVARES-PARRA MARTIN FERNANDO

OLIVARES A MINOR GENEVIEVE

Defendant

KURPIESKI COURTNEY ELISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOPEZ ANTHONY R. JR

LOPEZ ANTHONY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...) of 11/05/2020

11/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...) of 11/05/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...) of 11/05/2020

11/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...) of 11/05/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Expedited Petition to Approve Comp...)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/12/2020: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

12/8/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise; Hearing on...)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise; Hearing on...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise; Hearing on...) of 12/08/2020

12/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise; Hearing on...) of 12/08/2020

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Anthony R. Lopez, Jr., in Support of the Minors' Compromises

12/28/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Anthony R. Lopez, Jr., in Support of the Minors' Compromises

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

1/28/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

3/4/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

3/4/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

3/5/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/7/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Genevieve

1/29/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Genevieve

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/7/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account: As To Parties changed from DAYANA OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff), MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff) to MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff), DAYANA OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 01/28/2021 to 01/28/2021; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Anthony R. Lopez, Jr., in Support of the Minors' Compromises; Filed by: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Signed and Filed by: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff); FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff); FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Signed and Filed by: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff); FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff); FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: VANESSA SUSANA OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff),MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff),DAYANA OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff),FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff),GENEVIEVE OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 11/07/2019 to 11/07/2019; Result Date changed from 11/07/2019 to 11/07/2019; As To Parties changed from COURTNEY ELISE KURPIESKI (Defendant) to VANESSA SUSANA OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff); FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); GENEVIEVE OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff); DAYANA OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff); VANESSA SUSANA OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: COURTNEY ELISE KURPIESKI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff); FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); GENEVIEVE OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff); DAYANA OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff); VANESSA SUSANA OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: COURTNEY ELISE KURPIESKI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARTIN FERNANDO OLIVARES-PARRA (Plaintiff); FERNANDO OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); GENEVIEVE OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff); DAYANA OLIVARES, A MINOR (Plaintiff); VANESSA SUSANA OLIVARES, a minor (Plaintiff); As to: COURTNEY ELISE KURPIESKI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC08897    Hearing Date: December 08, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:    Tue., December 8, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME Olivares-Parra, et al. v. Kurpieski COMPL. FILED: 09-26-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC08897 DISC. C/O: 02-23-21

NOTICE:   NO (hearing) MOTION C/O: 03-10-21

TRIAL DATE: 03-25-21

PROCEEDINGS    PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF MINOR (x4)

MOVING PARTY:   Petitioner Martin Fernando Olivares-Parra on behalf of minor Claimants Fernando Olivares, Genevieve Olivares, Dayana Olivares, and Vanessa Susana Olivares

RESP. PARTY: None

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(CCP § 372, CRC, rule 7.950)

TENTATIVE RULING:

The Petitions to Approve Compromise of a Pending Action are GRANTED ON THE CONDITION THAT, before the hearing, Petitioner files proofs demonstrating Respondent was properly served with this action and properly given notice of this hearing. Otherwise, the hearing will be CONTINUED TO FEB 2, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. If continued, Petitioner must file proofs of service at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing. Failure to do so may result in the Petitions being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of December 4, 2020     [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of December 4, 2020     [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, the Petitions to Approve Compromise of a Pending Action are GRANTED ON THE CONDITION THAT, before the hearing, Petitioner files proofs demonstrating Respondent was properly served with this action and properly given notice of this hearing. Otherwise, the hearing will be CONTINUED TO FEB 2, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. If continued, Petitioner must file proofs of service at least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing. Failure to do so may result in the Petitions being placed off calendar or denied.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice. 

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lopez, Anthony Robert Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ ANTHONY R. JR. ESQ.