This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 15:10:41 (UTC).

MARK STRACHAN EXECUTOR OF THE STRACHAN TRUST VS JUAN PEREZ

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 MARK STRACHAN EXECUTOR OF THE STRACHAN TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JUAN PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0690

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK STRACHAN EXECUTOR OF THE STRACHAN TRUST

Defendant

PEREZ JUAN

El Monte, CA 91732

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

6/12/2018: Writ - Return

Answer

3/27/2018: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/27/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - on Complaint

3/20/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/20/2018: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Juan Perez)

3/22/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Juan Perez)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/22/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

3/20/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Writ of (name extension) - Possession: Mailed

5/8/2018: Writ of (name extension) - Possession: Mailed

Application for Writ of Possession

5/8/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/4/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/30/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/1/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

5/1/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2018

4/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2018

Proof of Personal Service

4/10/2018: Proof of Personal Service

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Mark Strachan Executor of The Strachan Trust (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 62.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession: Mailed; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Mark Strachan Executor of The Strachan Trust against Defendant Juan Perez on the Complaint filed by Mark Strachan Executor of The Strachan Trust on 03/20/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 11337 Cherrylee Drive, El Monte, CA 91732 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.; Writ of possession to be issued forthwith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/30/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Juan Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mark Strachan Executor of The Strachan Trust (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark Strachan Executor of The Strachan Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 03/21/2018 to 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A