This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2020 at 01:39:00 (UTC).

MARK R FRISBY VS PATRICK THOMASON

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 MARK R FRISBY filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against PATRICK THOMASON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8918

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FRISBY MARK R

Defendant

THOMASON PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant S...) of 10/08/2020

10/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant S...) of 10/08/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant S...)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant S...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation - No Order EARLY ORGANIZATIONAL MEETING

1/28/2020: Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - Stipulation - No Order EARLY ORGANIZATIONAL MEETING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service

10/28/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/28/2019

10/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/28/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

10/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) DENIED

10/1/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) DENIED

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) GRANTED

10/16/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) GRANTED

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

9/27/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

9/27/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Hearing03/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion re: Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service: Filed By: Mark R Frisby (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant S...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant S...) of 10/08/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service scheduled for 10/08/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/08/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service scheduled for 07/27/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 10/08/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion - Other for Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service scheduled for 05/22/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/27/2020 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) DENIED; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mark R Frisby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Mark R Frisby (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 10/01/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mark R Frisby (Plaintiff); As to: Patrick Thomason (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Mark R Frisby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark R Frisby (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC08918    Hearing Date: October 08, 2020    Dept: 26

Frisby v. Thomason, et al

MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO HAVE DEFENDANT SERVED A COPY OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PROOF OF SERVICE

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Mark Frisby’s Motion for Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

Pro Se Plaintiff Mark Frisby (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for legal malpractice against Defendant Patrick Thomason (“Defendant”) on September 27, 2019. Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service (“the Motion”), seeking an order that the Court serve the Summons, Complaint and proof of service on Defendant or have a U.S. Marshall deliver the papers to Defendant.

The Motion is not accompanied by a memorandum of points and authorities setting forth the legal or factual basis for the relief request. “The memorandum must contain a statement of facts, a concise statement of the law, evidence and arguments relied on, and a discussion of the statutes, cases, and textbooks cited in support of the position advanced.” (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1113(b).) Nor is the Court aware of any authority that permits for the Court or U.S. Marshall to serve an individual defendant with the Summons and Complaint.

Therefore, Plaintiff’s Motion for Court Order to Have Defendant Served a Copy of Summons, Complaint and Proof of Service is DENIED.

Court clerk to give notice.