This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2019 at 01:24:30 (UTC).

MARK D. WILLIAMS VS EDWARD MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 MARK D WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDWARD MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0578

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS MARK D.

Downey, CA 90240

Defendant

MARTINEZ EDWARD DBA ED'S AUTO ELECTRIC

Bellflower, CA 90706

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/17/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 06/21/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 06/21/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/21/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

6/21/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

5/16/2019: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

5/16/2019: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/17/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/17/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/11/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/29/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff MARK D. WILLIAMS against Defendant EDWARD MARTINEZ DBA ED'S AUTO ELECTRIC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARK D. WILLIAMS on 01/29/2019 for the principal amount of $1,011.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $1,061.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARK D. WILLIAMS on 01/29/2019, judgment entered on 04/17/2019 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARK D. WILLIAMS on 01/29/2019, judgment entered on 04/17/2019 as to EDWARD MARTINEZ is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 06/21/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 06/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/21/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: EDWARD MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 06/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 04/17/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MARK D. WILLIAMS against Defendant EDWARD MARTINEZ DBA ED'S AUTO ELECTRIC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARK D. WILLIAMS on 01/29/2019 for the principal amount of $1,011.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $1,061.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/17/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: MARK D. WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); As to: EDWARD MARTINEZ (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MARK D. WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); As to: EDWARD MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.