This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2020 at 12:26:21 (UTC).

MARINA ROMANO-HAMUY VS AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MARINA ROMANO-HAMUY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3536

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROMANO-HAMUY MARINA

Defendant

AMERICAN EXPRESS COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020

1/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/4/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/24/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/30/2020: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Marina Romano-Hamuy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Marina Romano-Hamuy on 12/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Marina Romano-Hamuy as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/10/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Marina Romano-Hamuy (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Filed By: Marina Romano-Hamuy (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/30/2020; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Marina Romano-Hamuy (Plaintiff); As to: American Express Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marina Romano-Hamuy (Plaintiff); As to: American Express Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less