This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2020 at 17:17:48 (UTC).

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES VS MAUREEN RINKER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MAUREEN RINKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2506

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES

Defendants

RINKER MAUREEN

MALDONADO SONIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2/24/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/12/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/12/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Maureen Rinker)

12/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Maureen Rinker)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Sonia Maldonado)

12/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Sonia Maldonado)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/3/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/5/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2/5/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession (Los Angeles): Filed By: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 120.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Marina Pacific Associates against Defendant Maureen Rinker and Defendant Sonia Maldonado on the Complaint filed by Marina Pacific Associates on 12/12/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 4478 Via Marina #913, Marina Del Rey, CA 90292 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession (Los Angeles): As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; Exact Name: Writ of Possession (Los Angeles); As To Parties changed from Sonia Maldonado (Defendant), Maureen Rinker (Defendant) to Maureen Rinker (Defendant), Sonia Maldonado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 123.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Maureen Rinker (Defendant); Sonia Maldonado (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Sonia Maldonado (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/02/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Maureen Rinker (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/02/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Sonia Maldonado; Maureen Rinker; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Marina Pacific Associates on 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Maureen Rinker (Defendant); Sonia Maldonado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Maureen Rinker (Defendant); Sonia Maldonado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Maureen Rinker (Defendant); Sonia Maldonado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Maureen Rinker (Defendant); Sonia Maldonado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO