This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2019 at 07:09:29 (UTC).

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES VS KRISZTINA MAYER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KRISZTINA MAYER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0141

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES

Defendants

MAYER KRISZTINA

Marina Del Rey, Ca 90292 Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

BULUT ZAFER

Marina Del Rey, Ca 90292 Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOLLENBECK LINDA TRACY

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/18/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/18/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/18/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Krisztina Mayer)

1/23/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Krisztina Mayer)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Zafer Bulut)

1/23/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Zafer Bulut)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/23/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/21/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/21/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/25/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2/25/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: Filed By: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Personal Service: Document changed from Proof of Service by Substituted Service to Proof of Personal Service; As To Parties changed from Krisztina Mayer (Defendant) to Krisztina Mayer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; As To Parties changed from Krisztina Mayer (Defendant), Zafer Bulut (Defendant) to Krisztina Mayer (Defendant), Zafer Bulut (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Marina Pacific Associates against Defendant Krisztina Mayer and Defendant Zafer Bulut on the Complaint filed by Marina Pacific Associates on 01/18/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 13816 Bora Bora Way #A111, Marina Del Rey, CA 90292 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: As To Unnamed Occupants: Yes; Exact Name: Writ of Possession; As To Parties changed from Zafer Bulut (Defendant), Krisztina Mayer (Defendant) to Krisztina Mayer (Defendant), Zafer Bulut (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Krisztina Mayer (Defendant); Zafer Bulut (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 97.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Krisztina Mayer (Defendant); Zafer Bulut (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Zafer Bulut; Krisztina Mayer; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Marina Pacific Associates on 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Krisztina Mayer (Defendant); Zafer Bulut (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Krisztina Mayer (Defendant); Zafer Bulut (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Krisztina Mayer (Defendant); Zafer Bulut (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Marina Pacific Associates (Plaintiff); As to: Krisztina Mayer (Defendant); Zafer Bulut (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARINA PACIFIC ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - LINDA T. HOLLENBECK ESQ