Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 02:27:36 (UTC).

MARIAM HARUTYUNYAN VS VIGEN ISKANDARYAN

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by MARIAM HARUTYUNYAN against VIGEN ISKANDARYAN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4963

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARUTYUNYAN MARIAM

Defendant

ISKANDARYAN VIGEN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/13/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/7/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/13/2019

5/13/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/13/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/31/2018

12/31/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/31/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/31/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

5/13/2019: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

5/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

4/30/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/10/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/15/2019

3/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/15/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Filed By: Mariam Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/13/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mariam Harutyunyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/13/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Dismissal entered on 03/15/2019, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Mariam Harutyunyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2018
  • Updated -- 12/31/2018 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department R to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Mariam Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/31/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mariam Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); As to: Vigen Iskandaryan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less