Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2017 at 09:11:56 (UTC).

MARIA NAYELI GARCIA NUNEZ, ET AL. VS INVESERVE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 MARIA NAYELI GARCIA NUNEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INVESERVE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7626

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NUNEZ MARIA NAYELI GARCIA

Bell Gardens, CA 90201

GARCIA JOSE EDUARDO

Bell Gardens, CA 90201

Defendants

HANSON TRUST

1345 West Haven Road,

San Marino, CA 91108

INVESERVE CORPORATION

123 S Chapel Ave,

Alhambra, CA 91801

HANSON JORGE P

San Marino, CA 91108

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/20/2017

10/20/2017: Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/20/2017

Unknown

10/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/20/2017: Unknown

(Ruling on Submitted Matter)

10/20/2017: (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

10/13/2017: Unknown

[Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/16/2017: [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Unknown

10/11/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/12/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/8/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/8/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/8/2017: Unknown

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/20/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Jose Eduardo Garcia and Plaintiff Maria Nayeli Garcia Nunez against Defendant Inveserve Corporation, Defendant Jorge P Hanson, Trustee and Defendant Hanson Trust on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Maria Nayeli Garcia Nunez, et al. on 08/08/2017 for the principal amount of $1,700.00 for a total of $1,700.00, joint and several.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN;; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $155.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Inveserve Corporation, Defendant Jorge P Hanson, Trustee and Defendant Hanson Trust. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Inveserve Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Inveserve Corporation (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Maria Nayeli Garcia Nunez (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge P Hanson (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Inveserve Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/07/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria Nayeli Garcia Nunez (Plaintiff); Jose Eduardo Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Inveserve Corporation (Defendant); Hanson Trust (Defendant); Jorge P Hanson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maria Nayeli Garcia Nunez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria Nayeli Garcia Nunez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jose Eduardo Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jose Eduardo Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESERVE INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant