Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/11/2020 at 18:36:53 (UTC).

MARIA JARAMILLO VS JIANGHA QIU

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 MARIA JARAMILLO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JIANGHA QIU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7014

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JARAMILLO MARIA

Hemet, CA 92544

Defendants

QIU JIANGHA

South Pasadena, CA 91030-7103

BALQUIEDRA CHERYL PASCUA

Glendale, CA 91208

AC3 REAL ESTATE INC.

1743 Hillside Dr.,

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

12/14/2017: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - (name extension) - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

10/5/2017: Other - (name extension) - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - Statement of Decision

9/28/2017: Other - (name extension) - Statement of Decision

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/28/2017

9/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/28/2017

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

9/28/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/22/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

8/3/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/19/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketOther - EXHIBIT RECEIPT; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/28/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketOther - Statement of Decision; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 09/27/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Maria Jaramillo against Defendant AC3 Real Estate, Inc. on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Maria Jaramillo on 08/03/2017 for the principal amount of $650.00 and costs of $135.00 for a total of $785.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Maria Jaramillo on 08/03/2017 as follows: Defendants Jiangha Qiu; Cheryl Pascua Balquiedra do not owe the plaintiff Maria Jaramillo any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: AC3 Real Estate, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Maria Jaramillo (Plaintiff); As to: Cheryl Pascua Balquiedra (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/16/2017; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria Jaramillo (Plaintiff); As to: Jiangha Qiu (Defendant); Cheryl Pascua Balquiedra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria Jaramillo (Plaintiff); As to: Jiangha Qiu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria Jaramillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2017-0017171 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less