This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2021 at 08:00:32 (UTC).

MARIA HERNANDEZ, ET AL. VS EMILY WINDT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 MARIA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EMILY WINDT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9344

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PICASSO SERENA

HERNANDEZ MARIA

Defendants

WINDT EMILY

WINDT ANGELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK ALEXANDER C.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

11/5/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/5/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/5/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2023
  • Hearing11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); SERENA PICASSO (Plaintiff); As to: EMILY WINDT (Defendant); ANGELA WINDT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); SERENA PICASSO (Plaintiff); As to: EMILY WINDT (Defendant); ANGELA WINDT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); SERENA PICASSO (Plaintiff); As to: EMILY WINDT (Defendant); ANGELA WINDT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK ALEXANDER C.