This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2019 at 03:03:16 (UTC).

MARIA ELENA GARCIA URANGA VS BUILD A DREAM, INC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 MARIA ELENA GARCIA URANGA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BUILD A DREAM, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3985

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA URANGA MARIA ELENA

Defendant

BUILD A DREAM INC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/8/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARIA ELENA GARCIA URANGA on 08/08/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the Plaintiffs request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 09/23/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MARIA ELENA GARCIA URANGA (Plaintiff); As to: BUILD A DREAM, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JNR Builders, LLC is a litigant