This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 at 01:50:06 (UTC).

MARIA E RAMIREZ VS RICHARD ROYBAL

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 MARIA E RAMIREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICHARD ROYBAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0006

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ MARIA E

Corona, CA 92880

Defendants

ROYBEL RICHARD

ROYBAL RICHARD

Montebello, CA 90640

 

Court Documents

Request to Pay Judgment to Court

5/2/2018: Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

4/19/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/19/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

4/19/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/19/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/19/2018

4/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/19/2018

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - $40.00

2/21/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - $40.00

Proof of Service - No Service - $35.00

2/9/2018: Proof of Service - No Service - $35.00

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/9/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

2/9/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/2/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2018
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Richard Roybal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • ** Case Name changed from MARIA E RAMIREZ vs RICHARD ROYBEL to MARIA E RAMIREZ vs RICHARD ROYBAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/19/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 04/19/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Maria E Ramirez against Defendant Richard Roybal on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Maria E Ramirez on 02/09/2018 for the principal amount of $125.00 and costs of $30.00 for a total of $155.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $40.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Richard Roybal. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Name Extension: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service - No Service $35.00; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Updated -- Richard Roybal (Defendant): Last Name changed from Roybel to Roybal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/19/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Maria E Ramirez (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria E Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Roybal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maria E Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Richard Roybel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria E Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less