This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 08:26:52 (UTC).

MARIA ANDERSON VS IKEA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 MARIA ANDERSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5661

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON MARIA

Defendants

IKEA

IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES INC.

FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELMAN JOSEPH S.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/8/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/6/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

7/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/28/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/7/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MARIA ANDERSON on 07/06/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by MARIA ANDERSON as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MARIA ANDERSON (Plaintiff); As to: FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS, INC (Defendant); Service Date: 09/04/2020; Service Cost: 63.72; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: MARIA ANDERSON (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA (Defendant); IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); FEDERAL CLEANING CONTRACTORS, INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARIA ANDERSON (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA (Defendant); IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARIA ANDERSON (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA (Defendant); IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARIA ANDERSON (Plaintiff); As to: IKEA (Defendant); IKEA DISTRIBUTION SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less