This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2020 at 02:16:47 (UTC).

MARGARITA SALVADOR VS JODY ANN VILLANUEVA

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 MARGARITA SALVADOR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JODY ANN VILLANUEVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0687

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALVADOR MARGARITA

Defendant

VILLANUEVA JODY ANN

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/6/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/6/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/19/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/01/2020

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/22/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/13/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/11/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/22/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2020

12/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2020

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MARGARITA SALVADOR on 02/06/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/01/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/10/2020 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 12/01/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/01/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/05/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: MARGARITA SALVADOR (Plaintiff); As to: JODY ANN VILLANUEVA (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: MARGARITA SALVADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MARGARITA SALVADOR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MARGARITA SALVADOR (Plaintiff); As to: JODY ANN VILLANUEVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less