This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2020 at 05:31:58 (UTC).

MARGARET A. WILLIAMS VS SYLVIA L. HARMON

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 MARGARET A WILLIAMS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SYLVIA L HARMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5536

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS MARGARET A.

HARMON SYVIA

Defendants

HARMON SYLVIA L.

WILLIAMS MARGARET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HARRIS MICHAEL

LONG HELEN GRAYCE

OMOTOSHO AYODELE O

 

Court Documents

Objection (name extension) - Objection PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DISCOVERY SERVED 08/11/2020

8/25/2020: Objection (name extension) - Objection PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DISCOVERY SERVED 08/11/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate or Order a Joint Trial of Is...) of 09/08/2020

9/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate or Order a Joint Trial of Is...) of 09/08/2020

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE OR ORDER A JOINT TRIAL OF ISSUES; P & A; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL HARRIS

7/2/2020: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE OR ORDER A JOINT TRIAL OF ISSUES; P & A; DECLARATION OF MICHAEL HARRIS

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Motion to Consolidate or Order a Joint Trial ...)

7/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Motion to Consolidate or Order a Joint Trial ...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

2/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Motion

11/25/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Motion

Motion to Transfer - Motion to Transfer

10/31/2019: Motion to Transfer - Motion to Transfer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge)

8/26/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge)]

8/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge)]

General Denial - General Denial

9/3/2019: General Denial - General Denial

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

9/4/2019: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

7/11/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Complaint - Complaint

6/10/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Hearing12/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Consolidation; Filed by: MARGARET A. WILLIAMS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Consolidation Required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate or Order a Joint Trial of Is...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate or Order a Joint Trial of Is...) of 09/08/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Consolidate or Order a Joint Trial of Issues scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/08/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase special status: Consolidation Required; Start Date updated from 09/08/2020 to 09/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase numbers 19STLC05536, and 18STUD11940 consolidated; case number 19STLC05536 is the lead case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketObjection PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DISCOVERY SERVED 08/11/2020; Filed by: MARGARET A. WILLIAMS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Syvia Harmon on 11/06/2018, Default entered on 11/27/2018, Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Margaret Williams (Defendant); As to: Syvia Harmon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Complaint filed by Syvia Harmon on 11/06/2018, judgment entered on 12/05/2018 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docket; On the Complaint filed by Syvia Harmon on 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Syvia Harmon against Defendant Margaret Williams on the Complaint filed by Syvia Harmon on 11/06/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 4426 3rd Ave, Los Angeles, CA 90043 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Syvia Harmon (Plaintiff); As to: Margaret Williams (Defendant); Service Date: 11/06/2018; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Margaret Williams; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Syvia Harmon on 11/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Syvia Harmon (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 11/06/2018; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Syvia Harmon (Plaintiff); As to: Margaret Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Margaret Williams (Defendant) to Margaret Williams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC05536    Hearing Date: September 08, 2020    Dept: 26

CONSOLIDATE

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048(a))

TENTATIVE RULING:

THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 HAVING PREVIOUSLY BEEN RELATED, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: (1) LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 IS TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE WITH ALL FUTURE HEARING DATES IN DEPARTMENT 91 VACATED; AND (2) THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES.

TRIAL DATE REMAINS SET FOR DECEMBER 7, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Margaret A. Williams (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendant Sylvia L. Harmon (“Defendant”) for wrongful eviction on June 10, 2019. Plaintiff was a tenant at 4426 3rd Avenue, Los Angeles (“the subject property”), which is owned by Defendant and Plaintiff’s brother. (Compl., ¶¶ 3-4.)

Before this action was filed, Defendant filed an unlawful detainer action against Plaintiff on November 6, 2018 based on unpaid rent: Harmon v. Williams, et al., LASC Case No. 18STUD11940 (“the Unlawful Detainer action”). There is currently no trial date set in the Unlawful Detainer Action.

Plaintiff previously filed a motion to consolidate the actions, which came for hearing on November 20, 2019 and February 26, 2020. Both times the Court allowed continuances to give Plaintiff an opportunity to properly serve Defendant with the Motion. At the hearing on February 26, 2020, the Court also ordered further briefing. On June 26, 2020, the Court found that Plaintiff had not filed proof of service or further briefing as ordered and placed the initial motion to consolidate off calendar.

On July 1, 2020, Plaintiff filed this second Motion to Consolidate or to Order Joint Trial of Issues (“the second Motion to Consolidate”). Notice of the second Motion to Consolidate was served on the parties on July 20, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

On February 26, 2020, the Court deemed this action related to the Unlawful Detainer action. Accordingly, the Court orders the Unlawful Detainer action transferred to Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse and that all future hearing dates in the Unlawful Detainer action in Department 91 be vacated.

Next, the Court considers whether to consolidate this action and the Unlawful Detainer action. Motions to consolidate are governed by Code of Civil Procedure section 1048. The purpose of consolidation is to avoid unnecessary costs or delay, avoid duplication of procedure, particularly in the proof of issues common to both action, and avoid inconsistent results by hearing and deciding common issues together. (See Estate of Baker (1982) 131 Cal.App.3d 471, 485.) The granting or denial of a motion to consolidate rests in the trial court's sound discretion, and will not be reversed except upon a clear showing of abuse of discretion. (Feliner v. Steinbaum (1955) 132 Cal.App.2d 509, 511.) Each case presents its own facts and circumstances, but the court generally considers the following: (1) timeliness of the motion: i.e., whether granting consolidation would delay the trial of any of the cases involved; (2) complexity: i.e., whether joining the actions involved would make the trial too confusing or complex for a jury; and (3) prejudice: i.e., whether consolidation would adversely affect the rights of any party. (See State Farm Mut. Auto. Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (1956) 47 Cal.2d 428, 430–431.)

In deciding whether to grant a motion to consolidate, the court should weigh whether the common issues predominate over the individual issues and whether any risks of jury confusion or prejudice to the parties outweighs the reduction in time and expense that would result from

consolidation. (Todd-Stenberg v. Shield (1996) 48 Cal.App.4th 976, 978.)

Unlawful detainer actions “provide landlords with a summary procedure for exercising their rights of repossession against tenants.” (Birkenfeld v. City of Berkeley (1976) 17 Cal.3d 129, 151; see also Larson v. City and County of San Francisco (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 1263, 1300 [“The unlawful detainer statutes provide for summary proceedings, with limited remedies.”.) Under the California Rules of Court, Standards of Judicial Administration, Title 2. Standards for Proceedings in the Trial Courts, Standard 2.2(i), “The goals for unlawful detainer cases are: (1) 90 percent disposed of within 30 days after filing; and (2) 100 percent disposed of within 45 days after filing.”

In the Court’s previous tentative ruling on the first motion to consolidate, it expressed concern that the trial in this action was set 11 months later than the trial in the Unlawful Detainer action and that such a delay would adversely affect Defendant’s right to a summary procedure in the Unlawful Detainer Action. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, however, the Court finds this consideration is no longer a bar to consolidation. Trial in the Unlawful Detainer action has been continued multiple times and there is no current trial date. A status conference regarding trial is scheduled in the Unlawful Detainer action for October 14, 2020. Trial in this action is currently set for December 7, 2020. The Court also previously determined that consolidating the actions would not make the trial too confusing or complex for a jury. Therefore, Plaintiff’s Motion to Consolidate or to Order Joint Trial of Issues is granted.

Conclusion

THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 HAVING PREVIOUSLY BEEN RELATED, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: (1) LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 IS TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE WITH ALL FUTURE HEARING DATES IN DEPARTMENT 91 VACATED; AND (2) THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES.

TRIAL DATE REMAINS SET FOR DECEMBER 7, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC05536    Hearing Date: September 03, 2020    Dept: 26

CONSOLIDATE

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048(a))

TENTATIVE RULING:

THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 HAVING PREVIOUSLY BEEN RELATED, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: (1) LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 IS TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE WITH ALL FUTURE HEARING DATES IN DEPARTMENT 91 VACATED; AND (2) THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES.

TRIAL DATE REMAINS SET FOR DECEMBER 7, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Margaret A. Williams (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendant Sylvia L. Harmon (“Defendant”) for wrongful eviction on June 10, 2019. Plaintiff was a tenant at 4426 3rd Avenue, Los Angeles (“the subject property”), which is owned by Defendant and Plaintiff’s brother. (Compl., ¶¶ 3-4.)

Before this action was filed, Defendant filed an unlawful detainer action against Plaintiff on November 6, 2018 based on unpaid rent: Harmon v. Williams, et al., LASC Case No. 18STUD11940 (“the Unlawful Detainer action”). There is currently no trial date set in the Unlawful Detainer Action.

Plaintiff previously filed a motion to consolidate the actions, which came for hearing on November 20, 2019 and February 26, 2020. Both times the Court allowed continuances to give Plaintiff an opportunity to properly serve Defendant with the Motion. At the hearing on February 26, 2020, the Court also ordered further briefing. On June 26, 2020, the Court found that Plaintiff had not filed proof of service or further briefing as ordered and placed the initial motion to consolidate off calendar.

On July 1, 2020, Plaintiff filed this second Motion to Consolidate or to Order Joint Trial of Issues (“the second Motion to Consolidate”). Notice of the second Motion to Consolidate was served on the parties on July 20, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

On February 26, 2020, the Court deemed this action related to the Unlawful Detainer action. Accordingly, the Court orders the Unlawful Detainer action transferred to Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse and that all future hearing dates in the Unlawful Detainer action in Department 91 be vacated.

Next, the Court considers whether to consolidate this action and the Unlawful Detainer action. Motions to consolidate are governed by Code of Civil Procedure section 1048. The purpose of consolidation is to avoid unnecessary costs or delay, avoid duplication of procedure, particularly in the proof of issues common to both action, and avoid inconsistent results by hearing and deciding common issues together. (See Estate of Baker (1982) 131 Cal.App.3d 471, 485.) The granting or denial of a motion to consolidate rests in the trial court's sound discretion, and will not be reversed except upon a clear showing of abuse of discretion. (Feliner v. Steinbaum (1955) 132 Cal.App.2d 509, 511.) Each case presents its own facts and circumstances, but the court generally considers the following: (1) timeliness of the motion: i.e., whether granting consolidation would delay the trial of any of the cases involved; (2) complexity: i.e., whether joining the actions involved would make the trial too confusing or complex for a jury; and (3) prejudice: i.e., whether consolidation would adversely affect the rights of any party. (See State Farm Mut. Auto. Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (1956) 47 Cal.2d 428, 430–431.)

In deciding whether to grant a motion to consolidate, the court should weigh whether the common issues predominate over the individual issues and whether any risks of jury confusion or prejudice to the parties outweighs the reduction in time and expense that would result from

consolidation. (Todd-Stenberg v. Shield (1996) 48 Cal.App.4th 976, 978.)

Unlawful detainer actions “provide landlords with a summary procedure for exercising their rights of repossession against tenants.” (Birkenfeld v. City of Berkeley (1976) 17 Cal.3d 129, 151; see also Larson v. City and County of San Francisco (2011) 192 Cal.App.4th 1263, 1300 [“The unlawful detainer statutes provide for summary proceedings, with limited remedies.”.) Under the California Rules of Court, Standards of Judicial Administration, Title 2. Standards for Proceedings in the Trial Courts, Standard 2.2(i), “The goals for unlawful detainer cases are: (1) 90 percent disposed of within 30 days after filing; and (2) 100 percent disposed of within 45 days after filing.”

In the Court’s previous tentative ruling on the first motion to consolidate, it expressed concern that the trial in this action was set 11 months later than the trial in the Unlawful Detainer action and that such a delay would adversely affect Defendant’s right to a summary procedure in the Unlawful Detainer Action. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, however, the Court finds this consideration is no longer a bar to consolidation. Trial in the Unlawful Detainer action has been continued multiple times and there is no current trial date. A status conference regarding trial is scheduled in the Unlawful Detainer action for October 14, 2020. Trial in this action is currently set for December 7, 2020. The Court also previously determined that consolidating the actions would not make the trial too confusing or complex for a jury. Therefore, Plaintiff’s Motion to Consolidate or to Order Joint Trial of Issues is granted.

Conclusion

THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 HAVING PREVIOUSLY BEEN RELATED, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDERS: (1) LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 IS TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE WITH ALL FUTURE HEARING DATES IN DEPARTMENT 91 VACATED; AND (2) THIS ACTION AND LASC CASE NO. 18STUD11940 ARE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES.

TRIAL DATE REMAINS SET FOR DECEMBER 7, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC05536    Hearing Date: June 26, 2020    Dept: 26

Williams v. Harmon, et al.

CONSOLIDATION

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048(a).)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Margaret A. Williams’ Motion to Consolidate is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Margaret A. Williams (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendant Sylvia L. Harmon (“Defendant”) for wrongful eviction on June 10, 2019. Plaintiff was a tenant at 4426 3rd Avenue, Los Angeles (“the subject property”), which is owned by Defendant and Plaintiff’s brother. (Compl., ¶¶ 3-4.)

Before this action was filed, Defendant filed an unlawful detainer action against Plaintiff on November 6, 2018 based on unpaid rent. Trial has been continued several times and the current trial date is January 8, 2020.

The Motion came for hearing on November 20, 2019 and February 26, 2020. Both times the Court allowed continuances to give Plaintiff an opportunity to properly serve Defendant with the Motion. At the hearing on February 26, 2020, the Court also ordered further briefing.

To date, no proof has been filed demonstrating service of the Motion on Defendant, nor has further briefing been filed.

Based on the foregoing, the Motion to Consolidate is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC05536    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 26

Williams v. Harmon, et al.

CONSOLIDATION

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048(a).)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

(CRC, rule 3.300(a).)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Margaret A. Williams’ Motion to Consolidate is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Margaret A. Williams (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendant Sylvia L. Harmon (“Defendant”) for wrongful eviction on June 10, 2019. Plaintiff was a tenant at 4426 3rd Avenue, Los Angeles. (Compl. ¶ 4.) The property is owned by Defendant and Plaintiff’s brother. (Compl. ¶ 3.)

Before this action was filed, Defendant filed an unlawful detainer action against Plaintiff on November 6, 2018 based on unpaid rent. Trial has been continued several times, and the current trial date is January 8, 2020.

Discussion

Plaintiff moves to relate, coordinate, or consolidate case no. 19STLC05536 (“this Action”) and case no. 18STUD11940 (the “UD Action”). The hearing on the Motion to Consolidate initially came before the Court on November 20, 2019. At that time, the Court noted that Plaintiff failed to serve the motion on Defendant’s counsel in this Action (Ayo Omotosho at 816 La Tijera Blvd., Suite 502, Los Angeles; see General Denial, filed 9/3/19). Because Plaintiff only served Defendant’s counsel in the UD Action (H.G. Long at 474 W. Orange Show Road, San Bernardino), the hearing was continued

to allow for proper service on Defendant’s counsel in this Action.

On November 25, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Continuance of Motion which only demonstrates service of the notice of new hearing date on defense counsel Ayo Omotosho and H.G. Long. (Notice of Continuance of Motion, filed 11/25/19.) Still no proof of service has been filed demonstrating service of the Motion to Consolidate on Defendant’s counsel in this action. Therefore, the Motion to Consolidate is placed off calendar.

Clerk to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC05536    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 94

Williams v. Harmon

CONSOLIDATION

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048(a).)

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

(CRC, rule 3.300(a).)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff’s motion is CONTINUED to February 26, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. to allow for proper service on Defendant’s counsel in this Action (Ayo Omotosho at 816 La Tijera Blvd., Suite 502, Los Angeles).

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

Plaintiff Margaret A. Williams (“Plaintiff”) sued Defendant Sylvia L. Harmon (“Defendant”) for wrongful eviction on June 10, 2019. Plaintiff was a tenant at 4426 3rd Avenue, Los Angeles. (Compl. ¶ 4.) The property is owned by Defendant and Plaintiff’s brother. (Compl. ¶ 3.)

Before this action was filed, Defendant filed an unlawful detainer action against Plaintiff on November 6, 2018 based on unpaid rent. Trial has been continued several times, and the current trial date is January 8, 2020.

II. Legal Standard & Analysis

Motion to Consolidate

Plaintiff moves to relate, coordinate, or consolidate case no. 19STLC05536 (“this Action”) and case no. 18STUD11940 (the “UD Action”). The court considers this motion to seek consolidation only, as there is no authority cited for coordination.

Plaintiff failed to serve the motion on Defendant’s counsel in this Action (Ayo Omotosho at 816 La Tijera Blvd., Suite 502, Los Angeles; see General Denial, filed 9/3/19). Plaintiff only served Defendant’s counsel in the UD Action. (H.G. Long at 474 W. Orange Show Road, San Bernardino).

Therefore, the motion is continued to February 26, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. to allow for proper service on Defendant’s counsel in this Action.  Plaintiff to give notice.