This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2021 at 11:03:08 (UTC).

MARCOS AVINA VS JACOB BUDDS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 MARCOS AVINA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACOB BUDDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1088

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVINA MARCOS

Defendants

MERCHANTS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC DBA MERCHANTS AUTOMOTIVE GROUP

BUDDS JACOB

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/21/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/7/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/26/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/11/2020

5/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/11/2020

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/10/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/10/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/10/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Marcos Avina on 03/10/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Marcos Avina as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Marcos Avina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/11/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Marcos Avina (Plaintiff); As to: Jacob Budds (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/21/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Marcos Avina (Plaintiff); As to: Jacob Budds (Defendant); Merchants Automotive Group, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Automotive Group, Inc. is a litigant