This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2016 at 17:26:06 (UTC).

MARC LUSSIER, M.D. VS. CARD, ANNE

Case Summary

On 05/20/2013 MARC LUSSIER, M D filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARD, ANNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8290

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TOWN CENTER SURGERY A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

MARC LUSSIER M.D. A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

MARC LUSSIER M.D.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CARD ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BENSON LAW GROUP - GORDON S. BENSON ESQ

Attorney at THE BENSON LAW GROUP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MATISON & MARGOLESE, ALC - VANA PARKER MARGOLESE

Attorney at MATISON & MARGOLESE, ALC

Cross Defendant Attorney

BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS - JOEL BRUCE DOUGLAS

Attorney at BONNE BRIDGES MUELLER O'KEEFE & NICHOLS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2014
  • RECEIPT FOR RECORD ON RECLASSIFIED CASE FILED. NEW CASE NUMBER BC534841 . PER CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 08/02/13, CASE WAS DEEMED RECLASSIFIED TO UNLIMITED CIVIL - STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 08/02/13 HAVING BEEN FILED PURSUANT TO SECTIONS CCP 403.010 THROUGH 403.090, AND FEES HAVING BEEN PAID, THIS CASE IS DEEMED RECLASSIFIED TO A GENERAL (UNLIMITED) JURISDICTION. RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • THIS CASE HAVING BEEN RECLASSIFIED & FEES HAVING BEEN PAID, ENTIRE FILE FORWARDED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE VIA COURT MESSENGER ON 01/24/14. CASE RECLASSIFIED FROM CIVIL LIMITED TO CIVIL UNLIMITED. PRIOR CASE NUMBER:13A08290 . RECEIPT # N/A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • NOTICE OF RECLASSIFICATION TO A GENERAL (UNLIMITED) JURISDICTION FILED & MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO STANLEY MOSK - UNLIMITED CIVIL. RE: RECLASSIFICATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • RECLASSIFICATION FEES PAID. RECEIPT # CHA469706004 . FEES DEPOSITED BY COUNSEL FOR CROSS-COMPLAINANT FOR CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 08/02/13. BALANCE OF FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00 PAID. PREVIOUS FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $65.00 PAID ON 08/05/13, RN:CHA270105057.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM CROSS-DEFENDANT MARC LUSSIER M.D. IN THE SUM OF $ 435.00 FOR ANSWER FILED ON 12/24/13 TO CROSS-COMPLAINT . RECEIPT # CHA485851024 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • CASE FILE RETAINED BY RH .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (MARC LUSSIER, M.D.) , (MARC LUSSIER, M.D.) A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION , (TOWN CENTER SURGERY) A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (CARD, ANNE) FILED. RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (CARD, ANNE) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2013
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CARD, ANNE) . RECEIPT # CHA270105057 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT(S): (CARD, ANNE) . CROSS-DEFENDANT(S): (MARC LUSSIER, M.D.) , (MARC LUSSIER, M.D.) A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION , (TOWN CENTER SURGERY) A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION . RECEIPT # N/A .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2013
  • NO SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CARD, ANNE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES RECEIVED. / RECEIPT NUMBER: CHA487303008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY GRACIELA FREIXES TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 05/15/14 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RECEIPT # 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOWN CENTER SURGERY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLAS JOEL B