This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2020 at 03:20:28 (UTC).

MAO HWA CHANG VS LORRAINE VILLALVAZO

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 MAO HWA CHANG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LORRAINE VILLALVAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0361

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DONNA HOLLINGSWORTH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG MAO HWA

Defendant

VILLALVAZO LORRAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ALLEN K

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/21/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/21/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

2/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Lorraine Villalvazo)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Lorraine Villalvazo)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

3/23/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/23/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/23/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 03/23/2020 entered for Plaintiff Mao Hwa Chang against Defendant Lorraine Villalvazo. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Mao Hwa Chang against Defendant Lorraine Villalvazo on the Complaint filed by Mao Hwa Chang on 02/21/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1933 E Idahome St, West Covina, CA 91791 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Lorraine Villalvazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 76.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Lorraine Villalvazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Lorraine Villalvazo (Defendant); Service Date: 02/23/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Lorraine Villalvazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Lorraine Villalvazo; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Mao Hwa Chang on 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 02/23/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Lorraine Villalvazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Lorraine Villalvazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mao Hwa Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Lorraine Villalvazo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Donna Hollingsworth in Department 3 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ALLEN KENT