This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 13:30:34 (UTC).

MALINDA L SOSA VS BEATRIZ TORRES

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 MALINDA L SOSA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEATRIZ TORRES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0768

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOSA MALINDA L

Defendant

TORRES BEATRIZ

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/2/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/21/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • Hearing04/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Malinda L Sosa (Plaintiff); As to: Beatriz Torres (Defendant); Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Malinda L Sosa (Plaintiff); As to: Beatriz Torres (Defendant); Service Cost: 135.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Malinda L Sosa (Plaintiff); As to: Beatriz Torres (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.