This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/09/2020 at 05:19:55 (UTC).

MALIKA GIVEHAND, ET AL. VS SUNNY HILLS AUTO, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 MALIKA GIVEHAND filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUNNY HILLS AUTO, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2500

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIVEHAND KEITH

GIVEHAND MALIKA

Defendants

SUNNY HILLS AUTO INC. DBA USED CAR MEGASTORES

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

GOLD ACCEPTANCE AUTOMOTIVE FINANCIAL SERVICES

RELIANT FINANCIAL CORPORATION

RELIANT FINANCIAL CORPORATION DBA GOLD ACCEPTANCE FINANCIAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/2/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

12/3/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

12/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

9/11/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Motion to be relieved as counsel

9/11/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Motion to be relieved as counsel

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/19/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/25/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Reply (name extension) - Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration

5/1/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Petitioner's Petition to Compel Arbitration

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/25/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration

Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/15/2019: Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel arbitration, For Court to pick Arbitration Forum, and Request for Costs

4/15/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel arbitration, For Court to pick Arbitration Forum, and Request for Costs

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/12/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/12/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • Hearing01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/29/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant); As to: Malika Givehand (Plaintiff); Keith Givehand (Plaintiff); Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant); As to: Malika Givehand (Plaintiff); Keith Givehand (Plaintiff); Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketOrder Proposed Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be relieved as counsel- civil; Filed by: Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 12/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/10/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): As To Parties changed from Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant), Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant), Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant) to Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant), Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant), Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Malika Givehand (Plaintiff); Keith Givehand (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant); Type: Fictitious Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Malika Givehand (Plaintiff); Keith Givehand (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Malika Givehand (Plaintiff); Keith Givehand (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Malika Givehand (Plaintiff); Keith Givehand (Plaintiff); As to: Sunny Hills Auto, Inc. (Defendant); Gold Acceptance Automotive Financial Services (Defendant); Hudson Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC02500    Hearing Date: December 10, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Attorney James S. Sifers, Esq.’s motion to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Sunny Hills Auto Sales, Inc. dba Used Car Megastores is GRANTED. The moving party has sufficiently complied with CCP § 284 and CRC 3.1362. Ruling to take effect upon filing of proof of service of the signed order on all parties.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.