This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2016 at 05:16:40 (UTC).

MALEK, FARSHID VS. CROMWELL, AMBER

Case Summary

On 05/09/2016 MALEK, FARSHID filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CROMWELL, AMBER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2257

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK A. YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALEK FARSHID

Defendant

CROMWELL AMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN MALEK, ESQ. - MORGAN MALEK

Attorney at MORGAN MALEK, ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (MALEK, FARSHID) , RECEIPT NO. PAID . MAIL SASE...

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • WRIT RECEIVED AS TO (MALEK, FARSHID) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 11:12A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. MARK A. YOUNG PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY MORGAN MALEK . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS : IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF FARSHID MALEK AND AGAINST DEFENDANT AMBER CROMWELL :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/22/16 . FOR (MALEK, FARSHID) . AGAINST (CROMWELL, AMBER) . PAST DUE RENT $ 1350.00 . DAILY DAMAGES $ 990.00 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 240.00 . TOTAL $ 2,580.00 . AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 13527 LEMOLI AVE. #13 HAWTHORNE, CA 90250 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CLERK'S OFFICE RE: POST-JUDGMENT PROCEEDINGS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 06/22/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT WES . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MALEK, FARSHID) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. // DEFENDANT FILED AS ANSWER. SUBMITTED ON 05/19/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CROMWELL, AMBER) . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CROMWELL, AMBER) . RECEIPT # FW .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (CROMWELL, AMBER) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (CROMWELL, AMBER) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT (CROMWELL, AMBER) IS PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES: JURY FEES AND EXPENSES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE MARK A. YOUNG .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # SM278868004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/07/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Malek