This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2019 at 12:37:28 (UTC).

MALEK, FARSHID VS BELL, MARILYN

Case Summary

On 12/09/2014 MALEK, FARSHID filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BELL, MARILYN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2919

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALEK FARSHID

Defendant

BELL MARILYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORGAN MALEK, ESQ. - MORGAN MALEK

Attorney at MORGAN MALEK, ESQ.

MALEK MORGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING MORGAN MALEK, ESQ.(X) . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING MARILYN BELL (X), IN PRO PER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/07/15 . FOR (MALEK, FARSHID) . AGAINST (BELL, MARILYN) . PAST DUE RENT $ 975.00 . DAILY DAMAGES $ 487.50 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 240.00 . TOTAL $ 1,702.50 . AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 13527 LEMOLI AVE. #8 HAWTHORNE, CA 90250 . A WRIT OF POSSESSION MAY BE ISSUED FORTHWITH, BUT NO FINAL LOCKOUT PRIOR TO JANUARY 16, 2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS : FOR PLAINTIFF FARSHID MALEK, AND AGAINST DEFENDANT MARILYN BELL. :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING MORGAN MALEK, ESQ.(X) . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING MARILYN BELL (X), IN PRO PER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 01/07/15 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. WES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BELL, MARILYN) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (BELL, MARILYN) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (BELL, MARILYN) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETED BY HAND DELIVERING A COPY OF THE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO THE APPLICANT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (BELL, MARILYN) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT (BELL, MARILYN) IS PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES: JURY FEES AND EXPENSES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BELL, MARILYN) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/08/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . 120914

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM470096017. Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Malek