This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 04:33:50 (UTC).

MALEK, FARSHID VS ADAMS, JAMIE

Case Summary

On 10/07/2015 MALEK, FARSHID filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ADAMS, JAMIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5303

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALEK FARSHID

Defendant

ADAMS JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MORGAN MALEK, ESQ. - MORGAN MALEK

Attorney at MORGAN MALEK, ESQ.

MALEK MORGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (MALEK, FARSHID) , RECEIPT NO. PAID .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • WRIT RECEIVED AS TO EXECUTION .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MALEK, FARSHID) FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF EXECUTION. DO NOT COMPLETE #24 WITH ANY INFORMATION AS IT IS FOR A WRIT OF POSSESSION. SUBMITTED ON 11/02/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • WRIT RECEIVED AS TO EXECUTION .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • WRIT RECEIVED AS TO POSSESSION .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 44.00 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/05/16 , FOR (MALEK, FARSHID) , AGAINST (ADAMS, JAMIE) , PAST DUE RENT $ 1320.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 1628.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , COSTS $ 240.00 . TOTAL $ 3,188.00 . RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF PREMISES NOT AT ISSUE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ADAMS, JAMIE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (ADAMS, JAMIE) ON 10/21/15 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/21/15 . FOR (MALEK, FARSHID) . AGAINST (ADAMS, JAMIE) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 13527 LEMOLI AVE. #7 HAWTHORNE, CA 90250 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WES , HONORABLE H. JAY FORD III .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/04/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500862021. Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Malek