This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 18:18:37 (UTC).

MAKA TATOLU VS VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 MAKA TATOLU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1424

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TATOLU MAKA

Defendant

VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC. DBA VILLA ELENA HEALTHCARE CENTER

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

1/10/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

8/27/2019: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

9/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

9/18/2019: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

7/26/2019: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

8/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/31/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/31/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/31/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/21/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

6/25/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/25/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/25/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

7/15/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/2/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/19/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 01/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketJudgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/11/2019 ; Status Date changed from 05/31/2019 to 09/11/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Pay Judgment to Court: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc. (Defendant) to Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 05/31/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/27/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 03/19/2019 to 03/19/2019; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff); As to: Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc. (Defendant) to Villa Elena Convalescent Hospital Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL is a litigant