This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2020 at 16:54:42 (UTC).

MAKA TATOLU VS HAROLD E. ROSE

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 MAKA TATOLU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAROLD E ROSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3727

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TATOLU MAKA

Defendant

ROSE HAROLD E.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/3/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/6/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 12/06/2019

12/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 12/06/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

10/16/2019: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

10/16/2019: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/16/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]

10/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/03/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/3/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/03/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/1/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/25/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/25/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment after trial de novo entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Maka Tatolu on 07/25/2019 as follows: Defendant Harold E. Rose does not owe the plaintiff Maka Tatolu any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Maka Tatolu on 07/25/2019, judgment entered on 10/03/2019 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Maka Tatolu on 07/25/2019, judgment entered on 10/03/2019 as to Harold E. Rose is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 12/06/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 12/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/06/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Harold E. Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Harold E. Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 10/03/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Maka Tatolu against Defendant Harold E. Rose on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Maka Tatolu on 07/25/2019 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $5,090.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff); As to: Harold E. Rose (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 07/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff); As to: Harold E. Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maka Tatolu (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/03/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Harold E. Rose (Defendant) to Harold E. Rose (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less