This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 08:13:00 (UTC).

MACIAS, MARIA VS VERDUGO, BERNICE J.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2012 MACIAS, MARIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VERDUGO, BERNICE J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1173

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACIAS MARIA

Defendant

VERDUGO BERNICE J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON, JAMES P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2013
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • ANSWER VOIDED PURSUANT TO GC 68634(G)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/10/13, 08:30 AM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED * * VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.