This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:09 (UTC).

MACATRAO, JAMES VS GULLEY, KENNY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 MACATRAO, JAMES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GULLEY, KENNY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0268

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACATRAO JAMES

Defendants

GULLEY KENNY

FRATIS TERRY

FRATIS SAMANTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACATRAO, JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • WE ARE UNABLE TO PROCESS THE ENCLOSED PAPER SUBMITTED ON 8/19/13 FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • WE ARE UNABLE TO PROCESS THE ENCLOSED PAPER SUBMITTED ON 8/19/13 FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • WRIT REJECT LETTER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY REJECTED (LA COUNTY) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less