This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:29 (UTC).

MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC VS SYED, TROY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SYED, TROY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0272

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC

Defendant

SYED TROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAL, VINCENT

Defendant Attorney

SYED, TROY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2013
  • THIRD PARTY ADDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED,ISSUED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/05/13, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION IS REJECTED. ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less