This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:32 (UTC).

MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC VS MOELLER, RICKY LEE

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MOELLER, RICKY LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0273

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC

Defendant

MOELLER RICKY LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REAL, VINCENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2013
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less