This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2018 at 10:05:07 (UTC).

MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC VS CANEZ, CASSANDRA

Case Summary

On 01/17/2012 MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CANEZ, CASSANDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0044

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MABRY MANAGEMENT CO INC

Defendants

CANEZ CASSANDRA

AREVALOS PERLANAIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REAL, VINCENT

REAL VINCENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORG COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LAW CLERK REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LAW CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • DECLARATION RE LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED DECLARATION RE LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO POSSESSION ONLY FILED SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO POSSESSION ONLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT NOT ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • MEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-20 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less