This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 05:57:09 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS ROBERTS, MICHAEL P

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERTS, MICHAEL P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7303

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ROBERTS MICHAEL P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE - LORI BRODBECK

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF HARRIS AND ZIDE

BRODBECK LORI

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES

11/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration C.C.P. 1033 B (1) & (2)

11/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration C.C.P. 1033 B (1) & (2)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration NON-MILITARY STAUS

11/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration NON-MILITARY STAUS

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/19/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/19/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/17/2019 entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (ROBERTS, MICHAEL P).

1/17/2019: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/17/2019 entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (ROBERTS, MICHAEL P).

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

2/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES )

2/19/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES )

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/19/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES ); Issued by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL P ROBERTS (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2511.19; Interest: 22.02; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL P ROBERTS (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 22.00; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 03/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/17/2019 entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (ROBERTS, MICHAEL P). Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (ROBERTS, MICHAEL P) on the Complaint filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 04/06/2017 for the principal amount of $2,216.69 and costs of $294.50 for a total of $2,511.19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 01/17/2019 entered for Plaintiff (LVNV FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (ROBERTS, MICHAEL P).: Result: Granted; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Declaration PLAINTIFFS WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 0% AND ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Declaration C.C.P. 1033 B (1) & (2); Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Declaration NON-MILITARY STAUS; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL P ROBERTS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Default entered as to MICHAEL P ROBERTS; On the Complaint filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 04/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (LVNV FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC on 04/06/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (LVNV FUNDING LLC), does 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROBERTS, MICHAEL P) ON 4/23/2017 . COSTS OF $ 69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371097. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/23/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.