Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/29/2020 at 09:15:41 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS LINA LIU

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINA LIU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7328

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LIU LINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIDE FLINT C

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Military Status

9/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Military Status

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/26/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • Hearing09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lina Liu (Defendant); Service Date: 09/25/2019; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lina Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Non-Military Status; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lina Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lina Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lina Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less