Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 05:01:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS KIMBERLY PADILLA

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIMBERLY PADILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0408

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PADILLA KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS RYAN EARL

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Hearing

1/8/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Hearing

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration of Mailing

12/15/2017: Declaration of Mailing

Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/15/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

11/13/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

11/13/2017: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

11/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/15/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/27/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/25/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Address for Ryan Earl Vos (Attorney) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kimberly Padilla (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/13/2017; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Kimberly Padilla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 1033 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less