Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 02:03:56 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JANICE MATTHEWS

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JANICE MATTHEWS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8230

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MATTHEWS JANICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK BROOKE Y.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/26/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1033

12/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1033

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

11/13/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorneys Fees

12/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorneys Fees

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

11/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

11/13/2017: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Hearing

1/22/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Hearing

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

12/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a)

12/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/27/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Janice Matthews (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Janice Matthews (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Declaration Declaration Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 1033; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Declaration Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest and Attorneys Fees; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Declaration Declaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Declaration Declaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(a); Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Janice Matthews (Defendant); Service Date: 12/10/17; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Janice Matthews (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LVNV Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 1033 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less