Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 11:41:06 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS CARLTON PORTIER

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CARLTON PORTIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0412

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PORTIER CARLTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDEZ LORENA O.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration of Mailing

12/20/2017: Declaration of Mailing

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing

1/22/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Fees

3/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

11/13/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge - Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 1033

3/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 1033

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

11/13/2017: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/19/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 1788.50

3/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: 1788.50

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

2/25/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

11/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 04/23/2019 entered for Plaintiff Lvnv Funding LLC against Defendant Carlton Portier an individual. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Lvnv Funding LLC against Defendant Carlton Portier an individual on the Complaint filed by Lvnv Funding LLC on 11/13/2017 for the principal amount of $1,797.25 and costs of $246.00 for a total of $2,043.25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 04/23/2019 to 04/23/2019; As To Parties changed from Carlton Portier (Defendant) to Carlton Portier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Default Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Carlton Portier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Address for Lorena O. Fernandez (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Carlton Portier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Declaration re: 1033; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration of Mailing; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Carlton Portier (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Lvnv Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 1033 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less