This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 13:55:45 (UTC).

LUTHER FORTINBERRY VS ADVANCED HAIR LLC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 LUTHER FORTINBERRY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADVANCED HAIR LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1299

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORTINBERRY LUTHER

Defendant

ADVANCED HAIR LLC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Small Claims Trial)

2/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Small Claims Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Small Claims Trial) of 02/10/2021

2/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Small Claims Trial) of 02/10/2021

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/11/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Carl Carlberg/Director

2/9/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Carl Carlberg/Director

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/15/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Attachment - Attachment

8/12/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

8/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/12/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Attachment - Attachment

8/12/2020: Attachment - Attachment

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Defendant Advanced Hair LLC against Plaintiff Luther Fortinberry on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Luther Fortinberry on 08/12/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Other: Defendant Advanced Hair LLC does not owe the Plaintiff Luther Fortinberry any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Small Claims Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter: Small Claims Trial) of 02/10/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Carl Carlberg/Director; Filed by: Advanced Hair LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 02/09/2021; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Luther Fortinberry (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Hair LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketAddress for Luther Fortinberry (Plaintiff) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- RETURNED MAIL: As To Parties changed from Luther Fortinberry (Plaintiff) to Luther Fortinberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Luther Fortinberry (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/09/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Luther Fortinberry (Plaintiff); As to: Advanced Hair LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Air, LLC. is a litigant