Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 07:33:23 (UTC).

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC VS PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 LUNA FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2641

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

DUARTE SANCHEZ PAOLA VERENICE AKA PAOLA DUARTE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

2/9/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

2/18/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

2/26/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

2/26/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

3/8/2021: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

3/10/2021: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/9/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/30/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/9/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/09/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/09/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff); Interest: 40.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff) to LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff) to LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff) to LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff) to LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff) to LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff LUNA FINANCIAL LLC against Defendant PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ AKA PAOLA DUARTE on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by LUNA FINANCIAL LLC on 09/23/2020 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,615.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant) to PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant) to PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant) to PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PAOLA VERENICE DUARTE SANCHEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Luna Financial, LLC is a litigant