This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 11:58:47 (UTC).

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC VS LUIS ANUEL JIMENEZ GONZALEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 LUNA FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LUIS ANUEL JIMENEZ GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2640

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants

GONZALEZ MELTRAN ROSA MARIA AKA ROSA M GONZALEZ

JIMENEZ GONZALEZ LUIS ANUEL AKA LUIS JIMENEZ

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • Hearing12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LUIS ANUEL JIMENEZ GONZALEZ (Defendant); ROSA MARIA GONZALEZ MELTRAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less