This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2020 at 19:44:33 (UTC).

LUIS ALFONSO VS MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 LUIS ALFONSO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MIRIAM RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6257

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFONSO LUIS

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ MIRIAM

MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

CALIFORNIA SECRETARY STATE AGNECY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WOOD DAVID F

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/7/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/29/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/15/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/17/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/16/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/23/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/23/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/17/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/8/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration RE: Meet And Confer in Advance of Filing A Demurrer

8/13/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration RE: Meet And Confer in Advance of Filing A Demurrer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/13/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/13/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Complaint - Complaint

7/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: Luis Alfonso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 01/13/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/13/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/13/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/13/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Luis Alfonso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Luis Alfonso (Plaintiff); As to: Miriam Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Miriam Rodriguez; On the Complaint filed by Luis Alfonso on 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2019
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Miriam Rodriguez; On the Complaint filed by Luis Alfonso on 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 08/13/2019 to 08/08/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Luis Alfonso (Plaintiff); As to: Miriam Rodriguez (Defendant); Merchants Bonding Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Luis Alfonso (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06257    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 94

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Merchants Bonding Company’s Demurrer to the Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Luis Alfonso (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action against \ Miriam Rodriguez and Merchants Bonding Company (“Defendant Merchants”). Defendant Merchants filed the instant Demurrer on September 17, 2019. Plaintiff untimely filed an opposition on January 7, 2020.

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court lacks jurisdiction to grant the relief sought in the Complaint. Specifically, the requests for cancellation of instrument and declaratory relief are outside the jurisdiction of this Court. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subds. (a)(7), (b); Orcilla v. Big Sur, Inc. (2016) 244 Cal.App.4th 982, 1011.)

THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

Court clerk to give notice.