This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 03:12:36 (UTC).

LUCY HUNT VS RAUL LOO

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 LUCY HUNT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RAUL LOO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4179

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNT LUCY

Defendant

LOO RAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN WILLIAM WARREN

Defendant Attorneys

JOHNSON SPENCER ALAN ESQ.

JOHNSON SPENCER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/12/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

5/21/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/21/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

5/24/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Order (name extension) - Order of Court's Final Ruling

7/28/2021: Order (name extension) - Order of Court's Final Ruling

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the Trial Date

7/28/2021: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the Trial Date

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Counsel

7/28/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Counsel

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/28/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/29/2021

7/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/29/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the ...)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the ...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

7/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the ...) of 07/29/2021

7/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue the ...) of 07/29/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff

9/22/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff

Notice of Lien - Notice of Lien

10/13/2021: Notice of Lien - Notice of Lien

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

10/13/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • Hearing04/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lien; Filed by: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- William Warren Green (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff: Filed By: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff; Signed and Filed by: William Warren Green, Esq. (Attorney); As to: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Fi...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Filed by Law Offices of William W. Green & Associates scheduled for 09/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/22/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff: Name Extension: for Plaintiff; As To Parties changed from LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff) to LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: RAUL LOO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL LOO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL LOO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL LOO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LUCY HUNT (Plaintiff); As to: RAUL LOO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC04179 Hearing Date: September 22, 2021 Dept: 26

Hunt v. Loo, et al. 20STLC04179

MOTION TO BE\r\nRELIEVED AS COUNSEL

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 284(2); CRC\r\nRule 3.1362)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Motion of Michael P. O’Sullivan,\r\nEsq. of Law Offices of William W. Green & Associates, to be Relieved as\r\nCounsel for Plaintiff Lucy Hunt, is GRANTED. THE PROPOSED ORDER HAS BEEN\r\nSUBMITTED. RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE DEMONTRATING\r\nSERVICE OF THE SIGNED AND CORRECTED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN WILLIAM WARREN