Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 09:43:45 (UTC).

LUCKY'S TWO-WAY RADIOS INC VS ROJANY, AVI

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 LUCKY'S TWO-WAY RADIOS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROJANY, AVI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4089

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUCKY'S TWO-WAY RADIOS INC

Defendants

ROJANY AVI

AIR INVESTMENT PARTNERSHIP LP

AJR PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHANE DIGIUSEPPE & RODGERS LLP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/4/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/04/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: LUCKY'S TWO-WAY RADIOS INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/04/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 04/06/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER TORT FILED Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LUCKY'S TWO-WAY RADIOS INC is a litigant