This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 23:01:19 (UTC).

LOWELL SANDERS VS ZADA AUDIO, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 LOWELL SANDERS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ZADA AUDIO, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1698

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDERS LOWELL

Culver City, CA 90230

Defendants

ELQUZA YASMIN FDBA ZADA AUDIO INC. PACIFIC STEREO 405

ZADA AUDIO INC.

5569 S. Sepulveda Blvd

Culver City, CA 90230

QUZA AHMAD DBA ZADA AUDIO INC

Culver City, CA 90230

ELQUZA YASMIN DBA ZADA AUDIO INC

Culver City, CA 90230

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/30/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 11/30/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Order on Request for Court Order

4/3/2017: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

4/3/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Request for Court Order and Answer

3/10/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

3/10/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

3/10/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination] - ORAP/ASSETS/INSTRUCTIONS

1/23/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination] - ORAP/ASSETS/INSTRUCTIONS

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

9/21/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/21/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

7/27/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

11/30/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/30/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/30/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

6/2/2017: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

6/6/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]

Minute Order - (Court Order)

5/15/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/15/2017

5/15/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 05/15/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Balance: $60.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Signed and Filed by: Lowell Sanders (Plaintiff); As to: Ahmad Quza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/15/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment amended on 05/15/2017 ; Status Date changed from 11/30/2016 to 05/15/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Invoice: Motion Fee- GC 70617 (a)(3)(6)(7); CCP 116.820; Fee: $60.00; Payment: 60.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0012667 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Held - Continued to 11/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/30/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • ** Case Name changed from LOWELL SANDERS vs YASMIN ELQUZA to LOWELL SANDERS vs Zada Audio, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lowell Sanders (Plaintiff); As to: Yasmin Elquza (Defendant); Zada Audio, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Zada Audio, Inc. (Defendant), Yasmin Elquza (Defendant) to Zada Audio, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lowell Sanders (Plaintiff); As to: Yasmin Elquza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0002331 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less