This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 09:29:37 (UTC).

LOURDES C. ARIAS, ET AL. VS FRANCISCO REYES

Case Summary

On 07/25/2016 LOURDES C ARIAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANCISCO REYES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1593

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARIAS LOURDES C.

Los Angeles, CA 90047

ARCE DAVID

Los Angeles, CA 90047

Defendant

REYES FRANCISCO

Los Angeles, CA 90047

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/25/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order of 02/27/2017

2/27/2017: Minute Order of 02/27/2017

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

2/27/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

9/15/2016: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

RETURNED MAIL - - Notice Of Entry Of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 1, 2016

9/9/2016: RETURNED MAIL - - Notice Of Entry Of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 1, 2016

RETURNED MAIL - - Notice Of Entry Of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 1, 2016

9/9/2016: RETURNED MAIL - - Notice Of Entry Of Judgment and Minute Order Dated September 1, 2016

Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

9/15/2016: Notice of Small Claims Appeal - (Trial De Novo)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

9/1/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

12/22/2016: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Minute Order of 09/01/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/1/2016: Minute Order of 09/01/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/25/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 07/07/2017

7/7/2017: Minute Order of 07/07/2017

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/10/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

7/7/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Minute Order of 10/21/2016

10/21/2016: Minute Order of 10/21/2016

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

10/21/2016: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Minute Order of 05/02/2017

5/2/2017: Minute Order of 05/02/2017

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

5/2/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment: Result Date changed from 05/02/2017 to 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/07/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 07/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/07/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lourdes C. Arias, et al. on 07/25/2016: Defendant Francisco Reyes does not owe the plaintiffs David Arce; Lourdes C. Arias any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: The evidence in this case established that the Plaintiff's and Defendant's adjacent lots are located near the corner of Denker Avenue and 101st Street. There is a narrow paved rectangular area across Mr. Arce's lot shown to be a 9 foot wide and 33.71 foot long rectangular easement in the Reiss Engineering survey done March 22, 1986. Neither Plaintiff nor Defendant have the right to obstruct or block this easement for any extended period of time, which might occur if someone were to park in the easement area and then go to bed. That appears to have been what happened on the day Ms. Arias' car was towed at the request of Mr. Reyes in the early morning hours as he needed to go to work. Because the evidence shows the Court that the towing...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lourdes C. Arias, et al. on 07/25/2016, judgment entered on 09/01/2016 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lourdes C. Arias, et al. on 07/25/2016, judgment entered on 09/01/2016 as to Francisco Reyes is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/01/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 09/01/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Lourdes C. Arias; Plaintiff David Arce against Defendant Francisco Reyes on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Lourdes C. Arias, et al. on 07/25/2016 for the principal amount of $363.50 and costs of $30.00 for a total of $393.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Lourdes C. Arias (Plaintiff); David Arce (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Reyes (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Lourdes C. Arias (Plaintiff); David Arce (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Reyes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0002169 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.