This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 07:13:28 (UTC).

LOUIS LLERA VS AFEWORK TENAGASHAW, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 LOUIS LLERA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AFEWORK TENAGASHAW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4072

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LLERA LOUIS

Defendants

TENAGASHAW AFEWORK

TPS PARKING CENTURY LLC DBA THE PARKING SPOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUZMAN EDUARDO MANUEL

Defendant Attorney

DOOLEY NATHAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

11/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted;)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted;)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

10/19/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Opposition to Defendants Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference;)

7/28/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference;)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

7/28/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

9/22/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nathan Dooley in support fo Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

9/22/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nathan Dooley in support fo Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

7/13/2021: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon - Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

6/17/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon - Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Answer - Answer

2/18/2021: Answer - Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 02/23/2021

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 02/23/2021

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

2/23/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

4/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/21/2020

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/21/2020

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2018: Complaint - Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The Parking Spot Erroneously Sued As TPS Parking Century, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted: Filed By: TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The Parking Spot Erroneously Sued As TPS Parking Century, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/25/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Non-Opposition to Defendant?s Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; Filed by: TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The Parking Spot Erroneously Sued As TPS Parking Century, LLC (Defendant); As to: Louis Llera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMotion to Deem RFA's Admitted; Filed by: TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The Parking Spot Erroneously Sued As TPS Parking Century, LLC (Defendant); As to: Louis Llera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Nathan Dooley in support fo Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; Filed by: TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The Parking Spot Erroneously Sued As TPS Parking Century, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 /Dismissal scheduled for 02/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Louis Llera (Plaintiff); As to: Afework Tenagashaw (Defendant); TPS Parking Century, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Louis Llera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 18STLC14072 Hearing Date: October 25, 2021 Dept: 26

Llera v. Tenagshaw, et al. 18STLC14072

MOTION\r\nTO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

\r\n\r\n

(CCP\r\n§§ 2033.280, 2023.010)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The Parking Spot’s\r\nMotion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions is\r\nGRANTED. PLAINTIFF LOUIS LLERA IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $250.00 TO DEFENSE\r\nCOUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

\r\n\r\n

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On June 25, 2021, Defendant TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The\r\nParking Spot (“Defendant TPS”) served Requests for Admissions on Plaintiff\r\nLouis Llera (“Plaintiff”). (Motion, Dooley Decl.,\r\nExh. A.) After Plaintiff failed to serve responses, Defendant TPS filed the\r\ninstant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted (“the Motion”) on September\r\n22, 2021. (Id. at ¶3.) No opposition has been filed to date.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort\r\nbefore a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc.,\r\n§ 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding\r\nparty fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Due to Plaintiff’s\r\nfailure to timely serve responses and resultant waiver of objections, Defendant\r\nTPS is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted. (Code\r\nCiv. Proc., § 2033.280.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Additionally, the Court is required to award sanctions under\r\nthe moving statute. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280, subd. (c).) Although properly\r\nnoticed, the sanctions sought are excessive under a lodestar calculation.\r\nSanctions are granted against Plaintiff in the amount of $250.00, based on one hour\r\nof attorney time billed at $250.00 per hour. (Motion, Tooley Decl., ¶4.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Conclusion

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Defendant TPS Parking Century, LLC dba The Parking Spot’s\r\nMotion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions is\r\nGRANTED. PLAINTIFF LOUIS LLERA IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $250.00 TO\r\nDEFENSE COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUZMAN EDUARDO MANUEL