Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 18:05:22 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT VS SAKHALIN FINNIE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAKHALIN FINNIE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5186

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

FINNIE SAKHALIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEELER DENNIS KENT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/20/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

12/20/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/20/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 12/16/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff); As to: Sakhalin Finnie (Defendant); Service Date: 07/22/2019; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff); As to: Sakhalin Finnie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less