Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 18:05:13 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT VS DIANNE FERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIANNE FERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5185

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendant

FERNANDEZ DIANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEELER DENNIS KENT

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/20/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - on Complaint

12/20/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

2/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/20/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

2/23/2018: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

12/20/2017: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff); As to: Dianne Fernandez (Defendant); Service Date: 01/30/18; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff); As to: Dianne Fernandez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less