Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2020 at 04:55:59 (UTC).

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY VS ANGIE MILLS

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGIE MILLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8651

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Defendant

MILLS ANGIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHEELER DENNIS KENT

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Hearing03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Angie Mills (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2019; Service Cost: 182.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Angie Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Angie Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District, a public entity (Plaintiff); As to: Angie Mills (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less